MD SB1262 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to request certain assistance from certain officials, the courts of the State, and health care facilities in the State in conducting an investigation of an applicant for a certain firearm license; establishing the Workgroup on Accurate and Integrated Background Information on Applicants for Firearm Licenses to study how investigations for applicants for firearms licenses are conducted and to recommend the best methods for obtaining the most comprehensive information on applicants; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Background Information for Firearm License Investigations - School Crisis Welfare Officers (School Safety Act 2018: Prevention)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Emergencies
Guns
Health Care Facilities
Human Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Safety
Sheriffs
State Police, Department of
Students
Time
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Emergencies
Guns
Health Care Facilities
Human Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Safety
Sheriffs
State Police, Department of
Students
Time