MD SB1261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |