MD SB1259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Naming a certain plaza of the Mary E.W. Risteau District Courts and Multi-Service Center in Harford County to be the H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza; providing for certain funding for the implementation of the Act; and requiring a certain administrative officer to add appropriate signage to reflect the naming of the plaza.
Title
Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568370/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
Signs and Billboards
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
Signs and Billboards