MD SB1252 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Correcting certain requirements pertaining to a certain earnings limitation to certain retirees of the Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; exempting certain retirees from a certain earnings limitation under certain circumstances; requiring certain participating employers to pay a certain offset under certain circumstances; providing that certain retirees are entitled to certain reimbursement for a certain reemployment earnings offset under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469
2018-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-16SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
2018-03-14SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-08SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback