MD SB125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the information required in the documentation supporting an application for qualification as a State-aided institution; and updating the criteria on which the State Superintendent of Schools must review and comment regarding a list of qualified State-aided educational institutions.
Title
State-Aided Educational Institutions - Qualification Criteria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |