MD SB1249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to September 30, 2020, the termination date of certain provisions of law that reduce the school facilities surcharge for certain multifamily housing and exempt certain dwelling units from the school facilities surcharge.
Title
Prince George's County - Reduction in and Exemptions From the School Facilities Surcharge - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {109031/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Boundaries
Construction
Counties - Local Laws
Exemptions
Fees
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Construction
Counties - Local Laws
Exemptions
Fees
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Zoning and Planning