MD SB1242 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the owner of a burial site or land encompassing a burial site that is more than 50 years old and in which the majority of persons interred have been interred for more than 50 years to consult with the Maryland Historical Trust regarding certain matters; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit on a real property improvement that substantiates, demarcates, commemorates, or celebrates a burial ground; etc.
Title
Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2018-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
2018-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {677579/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Historical Matters
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Zoning and Planning
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Historical Matters
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Zoning and Planning