MD SB1239 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making certain provisions relating to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor under certain circumstances applicable to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in the event of an adverse immigration action against a parent; authorizing a parent to designate a standby guardian by means of a written designation; providing that the appointment of a standby guardian may not be construed to require the termination of parental rights; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-4) (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 749
2017-12-08SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (135-4)
2018-04-09HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-3)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-04-09HouseHearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
2018-04-09HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2018-04-09HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {168276/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-04-02SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback