MD SB1223 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an authorized provider to attest on the registration form to the Maryland Department of Health that the authorized provider completed 2 hours of continuing education before the authorized provider may be registered by the Department or renew a certain registration to dispense a controlled dangerous substance; requiring certain continuing education to be related to the prescribing or dispensing of controlled dangerous substances and be recognized by certain licensing or accrediting entities; etc.
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {437570/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Cannabis
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Public Health
Registration
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Public Health
Registration