MD SB1218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Program to focus on preventing and ending youth homelessness in the State and addressing disparities based on race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, and gender identity; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Program; establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Fund; requiring, in and after the third year of funding, the Department to allocate 50% of the money appropriated to the Fund for certain housing programs; etc.
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {807679/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Data
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Treasurers
Youth
Comptroller
Data
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Treasurers
Youth