MD SB1213 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the county superintendent of schools or the county superintendent's designated representative, when making a decision to extend a student's suspension, to complete a certain investigation by the 10th day of a student's initial suspension; requiring a certain student to return to school after a suspension if a certain investigation has not been completed within a certain period of time except under certain circumstances; requiring a county board to provide access to a certain student to the student's assignments; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-08SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback