MD SB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person who is the subject of a certain warrant to file a certain petition for expungement; providing that a person who, on or after October 1, 2018, has been charged with the commission of a certain crime, has been charged with a certain civil offense or infraction, or is the subject of a certain warrant is entitled to automatic expungement of certain records under certain circumstances; specifying that certain dispositions are eligible for automatic expungement at certain times; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Fees
Judges
Law Enforcement
Notices
Records
Time
Warrants
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Fees
Judges
Law Enforcement
Notices
Records
Time
Warrants