MD SB121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "abuse" for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to domestic violence to include revenge porn.
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {353723/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected (48-77) (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {353723/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected (48-77) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {508879/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Domestic Violence
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Family Law
Harassment
Pornography
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Family Law
Harassment
Pornography
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones