MD SB121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-22 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-22 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the certification requirement regarding a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment to allow the second individual making the certification to be a psychologist, rather than a second physician; etc.
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-5) (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-5) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |