MD SB1208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending to December 31, 2024, the termination date of the Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program; altering the period of time during which the subsidy required under the Program may not exceed a certain amount; repealing the requirement that the Program annually provide a certain subsidy of up to the full amount of the Medicare Part D coverage gap; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension and Repeal of Subsidy for Medicare Part D Coverage Gap

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-30HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-03-27HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {607179/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback