MD SB1204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "public school employee" for Baltimore City to include Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps (JROTC) instructors for the purpose of authorizing collective bargaining for JROTC instructors.
Title
Baltimore City - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |