MD SB1202 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship Program; establishing eligibility criteria for the scholarship that requires an individual to be a member of the Reserve Officer Training Corps, a certain minority student, and a student at a historically black college or university; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to award 25% of its grant money to students at Bowie State University and 75% to certain other colleges and universities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseDelegates Luedtke, Patterson, and Shoemaker
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenators Pinsky, Bates, and Kagan
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {585064/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {893527/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {264230/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateLaid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {264230/1
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-14SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-27SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-26SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1202&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1202f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1202t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1202e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_26423001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_89352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_58506401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_86382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_93372801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb1202.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1202_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0675.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1202_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1161.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1202_93372801.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1406.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1516.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback