MD SB1201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Industrial Hemp Pilot Program to authorize and facilitate the research of industrial hemp and any aspect of growing, cultivating, harvesting, processing, manufacturing, transporting, marketing, or selling industrial hemp for agricultural, industrial, or commercial purposes; requiring the Department of Agriculture to certify and register a site that will be used to grow or cultivate industrial hemp; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations