MD SB120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt certain rules and regulations applicable to certain reinsurance arrangements; limiting the application of the rules and regulations to certain reinsurance; providing that the rules and regulations may require a certain insurer to use the manual adopted by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners for a certain purpose; and prohibiting the regulations from applying to certain cessions to certain assuming insurers.
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Death
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time