MD SB120 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that procurement procedures seek to award 7 percent and 10 percent of a unit's total dollar value of contracts to African-American-owned and women-owned businesses respectively; clarifying that it is a goal that 25 percent of a unit's total dollar value of procurement contracts be made to certified minority business enterprises; requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs, in consultation with specified others, to establish guidelines, including possible subgoals; etc.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Participation
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (132-6) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Discrimination
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Women
Contractors
Contracts
Discrimination
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Women