MD SB12 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB963

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health to be the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health and providing that the Office is an independent unit of the State, rather than a unit in the Department; requiring an annual report by December 1 of the Office's activities investigating fraud and waste of certain funds, referrals to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit, recoveries of mistaken claims paid in error, recoveries of the cost of benefits mistakenly paid, and regulatory changes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateReturned Passed
2021-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2021-03-25HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-24HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-03SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-09-23SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB393 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed
SB963 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2502(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2502.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback