MD SB1196 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore County annually to spend, from the fines collected as a result of violations enforced by speed monitoring systems in school zones, up to $5,000 per public high school for after-prom parties.
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Photography
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Photography
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally