MD SB119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the eligibility of specified employees of the Maryland Higher Education Commission to participate in the Optional Retirement Program; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Title
State Personnel and Pensions - Optional Retirement Program - Maryland Higher
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing 2/9 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |