MD SB118 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an appointment to the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City made when the Senate is not in session be subject to the advice and consent of the Senate when the Senate next convenes; authorizing the Board to issue a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to an applicant who holds or has applied for a Class 9 limited distillery license; providing that a certain Class D beer, wine, and liquor license may be transferred only to a certain license holder; authorizing the Board to waive certain restaurant requirements; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653397/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104235/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Communications
Data
Emergency Bills
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Communications
Data
Emergency Bills
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Restaurants