MD SB1173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Home Sprinkler and Fire Safety Assistance Fund to provide grants to offset the costs of installing a sprinkler system when purchasing a home; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2020 through 2022, to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of $300,000 for the Fund; etc.
Title
Home Sprinkler and Fire Safety Assistance Fund - Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Fire Protection
Grants
Housing
Revenue and Taxes
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Fire Protection
Grants
Housing
Revenue and Taxes