MD SB1171 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim March as Maryland Sportsmen and Sportswomen Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge the Department of Natural Resources and certain local departments to properly observe Maryland Sportsmen and Sportswomen Month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmen and Sportswomen Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-19SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback