MD SB117 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB26
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to collect litter and mow the grass along State highways and certain interstate highways with a certain frequency; requiring the Administration to contract with a certain company to collect litter and provide mowing services under the Act; and specifying that the provision of litter collection and mowing services under the Act be considered a supplemental environmental project for certain purposes.
Title
State Highway Administration - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2022-11-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB26 (Carry Over) 2021-01-15 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Contracts
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Highways
Litter
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation - Highways
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Ex-Offenders
Highways
Litter
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 609.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0117?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0117f.pdf |