MD SB117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners to conduct an unannounced inspection of the office of podiatrists against whom a specified complaint has been filed with the Board, to determine compliance with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention's guidelines on universal precautions.
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Unannounced Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-14 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-11 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/3 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |