MD SB1165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "veteran" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing veteran-owned small business enterprise participation in procurement to include only individuals who are verified by the State Department of Veterans Affairs as having served on active duty in the armed forces of the United States, other than for training and were discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable; etc.
Title
Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-0) |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Minorities
Procurement
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Women
Minorities
Procurement
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Women