MD SB116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period during which the Office of Legislative Audits and the Legislative Auditor are required to audit specified State funds, programs, authorities, units, and a specified local liquor board; requiring the audit of each unit of State government to be conducted at an interval ranging from 3 to 4 years unless the Legislative Auditor determines, on a per case basis, that more frequent audits are required; etc.
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-3) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-3) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Aircraft
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Construction
Contractors
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disclosure
Education
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Farmland
Food
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Legal Aid
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Mass Transit
Natural Resources
Ports
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Service Commission
Records
Registers of Wills
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Utilities
Agriculture
Aircraft
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Construction
Contractors
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disclosure
Education
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Farmland
Food
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Legal Aid
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Mass Transit
Natural Resources
Ports
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Service Commission
Records
Registers of Wills
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Utilities