MD SB1158 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount available for a purse for the Maryland International thoroughbred race by specifying an amount up to $500,000; specifying that the Maryland International is a graded stakes race; authorizing the Maryland International to continue to be conducted after June 30, 2019; requiring that certain money distributed to the Racing Special Fund and paid for certain purposes remain available for those purposes and may not be used for any other purpose; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937375/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Advertising
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Horse Racing
Lottery
Racing
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Horse Racing
Lottery
Racing
Rules and Regulations
Sunset