MD SB1158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the power plant research program of the Department of Natural Resources to include in its research an evaluation of the pollinator benefits that would occur under a pollinator-friendly vegetation management standard or pollinator habitat plan implemented on the land on which a proposed or an existing ground-mounted solar generation facility is located; requiring the Department to adopt a specified Solar Site Pollinator Habitat Planning and Assessment scorecard; etc.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-0) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-0) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey) Withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey) |
2017-04-10 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Healey) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {153696/1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957570/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alternative Energy Sources
Animals
Bees
Birds
Fees
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Animals
Bees
Birds
Fees
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Utility Regulation