MD SB1157 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $300,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Southern Maryland Carousel Group, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Southern Maryland Carousel project, located in Charles County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateHearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-10SenateHearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-02-19SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback