MD SB1156 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to provide grants to eligible counties to establish pretrial services programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring certain distributions from the Fund to be used to supplement and not supplant certain other funds; establishing the requirements for a certain pretrial services program; etc.
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-5) (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-5) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {158771/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Chemical Tests
Comptroller
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Pretrial Detention or Release
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Treasurers
Chemical Tests
Comptroller
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Pretrial Detention or Release
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Treasurers