MD SB1145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain exceptions to the requirement that certain public school property must be held in trust by a county board of education; authorizing a county or a county board to lease certain property; and excluding certain lease payments made by a county board of education from the maintenance of effort calculation.
Title
County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Counties
Education, Boards of
Estates and Trusts
Leases and Rent
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Real Property
Titles
Education, Boards of
Estates and Trusts
Leases and Rent
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Real Property
Titles