MD SB1141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under certain circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to individuals who do not have a high school diploma or GED and have been unemployed for at least 6 months but who have been seeking employment and who are attending a community college and seeking vocational certificates or associate's degrees; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; etc.
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Tuition
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Tuition