MD SB1141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "hunt" as it applies to the laws governing hunting and wildlife in the State to include the act of chasing or in any manner pursuing fox, whether armed or unarmed; repealing a provision of law excluding the sport of fox chasing from the definition of "hunt"; and repealing the exemption for an unarmed person participating in an organized fox hunt from the requirement under specified circumstances to obtain a hunting license.
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and Chasing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |