MD SB1140 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "child" for the purposes of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to mean a biological child, an adopted child, or a stepchild, not to include a foster child, a grandchild, or a descendant more remote than a grandchild; and applying the Act retroactively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {344739/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback