MD SB114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the distribution of a tobacco product, an electronic smoking device, cigarette rolling papers, or a coupon redeemable for a tobacco product to a minor, with specified exceptions; authorizing a county health officer or specified designees of a county health officer to issue a citation for a violation of the Act; establishing specified civil penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Cigarettes
Civil Actions
Counties
Health
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Smoking
Tobacco
Civil Actions
Counties
Health
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Smoking
Tobacco