MD SB1134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; specifying the duties of the Council; authorizing the Council to request certain technical assistance; requiring the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFloor Amendment {173527/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFloor Amendment {973223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {388778/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-01SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-12SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback