MD SB1131 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified students residing in Somerset County may enroll full time in specified community colleges and pay no tuition or fees for up to 3 years if specified conditions are met; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to pay 100% of in-county tuition and fees for specified eligible students; requiring a student to repay funds spent on the student's behalf to the Commission and county if the student is guilty of a felony; etc.
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Fees
Higher Education
Somerset County
Students
Tuition
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Fees
Higher Education
Somerset County
Students
Tuition