MD SB1121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt regulations to require that a business qualifies as a small business if it has obtained certification under a federal small business certification program; altering a requirement that certain regulations facilitate certification of minority businesses that have received certification under the federal Disadvantaged Business Enterprise Program; etc.
Title
Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of