MD SB1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to erect an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque at each railroad grade crossing in the State that is no longer in use by a railroad; specifying that the design and placement of a plaque shall be erected in accordance with the Federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; and exempting specified vehicles from the requirement to stop at specified railroad grade crossings if the railroad grade crossing has an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque.
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707976/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Railroads
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Railroads
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road