MD SB1119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Treasurer to invest or reinvest specified funds in a specified obligation issued and unconditionally guaranteed by a supranational issuer; defining a specified term; etc.
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Credit
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
International Affairs
Investments
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers
Credit
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
International Affairs
Investments
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Treasurers