MD SB1117 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Human Services to use certain unexpended funds to establish a certain arrearage prevention program; providing that the purpose and intent of the program is a one-time grant of money to establish ongoing arrearage prevention activities in the State; providing for the Department to select certain program recipients for certain purposes; requiring the Department, for fiscal year 2019, to dedicate $750,000 of unexpended funds in the Electric Universal Service Program to the arrearage prevention program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-18) (Y: 117 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 697
2018-03-28SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (116-18)
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {603598/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1117&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1117f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1117t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1117e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_697_sb1117e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb1117_60359801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb1117.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1117_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1117_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0638.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0833.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0861.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback