MD SB1113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the transfer of specified Class B-D-7 alcoholic beverages licenses from specified blocks in Baltimore City to other blocks in Baltimore City.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {213328/1 Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City