MD SB1112 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a qualified business entity operating a specified aerospace, electronics, or defense contract tax credit project to claim a credit against the State income tax; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to certify a business entity as a qualified business entity within a specified period of time; providing that a project is eligible for designation by the Department as an aerospace, electronics, or defense contract tax credit project under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (76-57) (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (B. Robinson S) {173221/1 Rejected (33-101) (Y: 33 N: 101 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {273128/1 Rejected (14-29) (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320
2016-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (76-57)
2016-04-11HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
2016-04-11HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate S. Robinson) {173221/1 Rejected (33-101)
2016-04-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-11HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-11HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2016-04-09HouseHearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
2016-04-08HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2016-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (31-13)
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {273128/1 Rejected (14-29)
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-03-16SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-01SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2016-02-23SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1112?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb1112f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb1112t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_320_sb1112t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1112_27312801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1112_17322101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb1112.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb1112_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb1112_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1112,s-1115&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1112,s-1159&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1112,h-1432&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1112,h-1433&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback