MD SB111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurers to send a written notice to policyholders of universal or variable life insurance if the policy contains a provision that allows the policyholder to reduce the face amount of the policy; requiring that the notice state that the policy allows for a reduction of the face amount as an option to retain coverage and a certain amount to be paid; and requiring that the notice be sent to the policyholder's last known address at the beginning of a certain grace period and at least 30 days before the termination of coverage.
Title
Insurance - Universal and Variable Life Insurance - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {517974/1 Adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |