MD SB1106 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring applicants for a license or certificate to provide real estate appraisal services to apply for a national and State criminal history records check, submit a complete set of fingerprints, and pay the fees for the records checks; requiring the Criminal Justice Information System of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide the records and a specified receipt of the application to the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors; etc.
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appraisals
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Real Estate
Records
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Real Estate
Records