MD SB1101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a borrower under a reverse mortgage loan to designate a person to whom specified notice must be sent by the reverse mortgage lender; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send a copy of a specified notice to a person designated by the reverse mortgage borrower; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send a specified notice to a reverse mortgage borrower and a specified person designated by the borrower 30 days after the lender makes a payment for specified property taxes or insurance; etc.
Title
Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Mortgages
Property Tax
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Mortgages
Property Tax